EP0877107 - Method and apparatus for the transport of a group of cans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt Spinnereimaschinenbau AG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85046 Ingolstadt / DE | [1998/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kovacs, Otmar Eibenweg 3 92334 Berching / DE | 02 /
Ueding, Michael Schäffbräustrasse 17 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte CANZLER & BERGMEIER, Beethovenstrasse 10 85101 Lenting / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105377.0 | 25.03.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | DE1997119765 | 10.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719765 | [1998/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0877107 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0877107 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877107 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0877107 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01H9/00, D01H9/18 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
D01H9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/46] | D01H9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/52] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Transportieren einer Kannengruppe | [1998/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for the transport of a group of cans | [1998/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le transport d'un groupe de pots | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 15.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.2003
01.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative Vollrath, Ulrich Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Textilmaschinenfabrik Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.2003
Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative Vollrath, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | 23.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.04.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.04.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.08.2004 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.01.2005 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.12.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/21] | FR | 07.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2587042 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,10,11 * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 34 * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 35; figures 1-5; claims 1-4 * [A] 24,25,37; | [A]EP0443418 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1,13* the whole document *; | [YA]WO9118135 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,10,11 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph 2; figures 1-4,6,8,12,15 * [A] 13,17,24,26,35; | [A]DE4231698 (ELITEX USTI NAD ORLICI [CS]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9408079 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE], et al) [AD] 1,3,10 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 4; figures 1-4; claims 1-4 * | Opposition | DE579099 | DE1781030 | DE2439769 | DE3532172 | DE3734258 | EP0508365 |