EP0871066 - Colour photographic silver halide material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odenwälder, Heinrich, Dr. Am Arenzberg 37 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Langen, Hans, Dr. Weidengarten 16 53129 Bonn / DE | 03 /
Hagemann, Jörg, Dr. Neanderweg 1a 51061 Köln / DE | 04 /
Henseler, Klaus Im Eichenforst 15 51069 Köln / DE | [1998/42] | Application number, filing date | 98105593.2 | 27.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | DE1997114614 | 09.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19714614 | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871066 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871066 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/392, G03C7/396, G03C7/388 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
G03C7/3882 (EP,US);
G03C7/39268 (EP,US);
G03C7/396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/25] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbfotografisches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1998/42] | English: | Colour photographic silver halide material | [1998/42] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 24.07.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4366240 (LAESSIG WOLFGANG, et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 20 * * column 3, line 43 - line 49 * * column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 20 * * column 19, line 44 - column 20, line 14 *; | [A]US4369243 (CREDNER HANS-HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 25, line 15 - line 63 ** column 27, line 61 - column 28, line 14 * |