EP0873899 - Cooling air guide for cooling the propulsion system of an armoured wheeled or tracked vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/44] | Cooling air guide for cooling the propulsion system of an armored wheeled or tracked vehicle | ||
[1998/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Falckensteiner Strasse 2 24159 Kiel / DE | [2003/03] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Henschel Wehrtechnik GmbH Henschelplatz 1 34127 Kassel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreckenberg, Klaus Pappelweg 6 34246 Vellmar / DE | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Jens Patentanwalt Brahmsweg 3 30989 Gehrden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Wolf, Jens, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Ulmenweg 1 34292 Ahnatal / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105620.3 | 27.03.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | DE1997113017 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19713017 | [1998/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0873899 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0873899 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/08, B60K11/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
B60K11/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/44] | B60K11/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/30] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlluftführung zur Kühlung der Antriebsanlage eines gepanzerten Rad- oder Kettenfahrzeuges | [1998/44] | English: | Cooling air guide for cooling the propulsion system of an armoured wheeled or tracked vehicle | [1998/45] | French: | Guidage de l'air de refroidissement pour le système de propulsion d'un véhicule blindé à roues ou à chenilles | [1998/44] |
Former [1998/44] | Cooling air guide for cooling the propulsion system of an armored wheeled or tracked vehicle | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3407570 (THYSSEN INDUSTRIE) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE2040285 (RHEINSTAHL AG) [DA] 1 * page 1 - page 2; figure - *; | [A]DE3618185 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0761941 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 2; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE3407570 | DE2040285 |