EP0869581 - Electrical connector with anti-chattering interconnection means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION Suite 450, 4550 New Linden Hill Road Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION Suite 450, 4450 New Linden Hill Road Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotea, Gheorghe Am Felsenkeller 17 64347 Griesheim / DE | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | ||
Former [1998/41] | Reuteler, Raymond Werner AMP International Enterprises Ltd., AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach/SG / CH | Application number, filing date | 98105778.9 | 22.08.1995 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | GB19940016986 | 23.08.1994 Original published format: GB 9416986 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0869581 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0869581 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869581 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/533, H01R13/52 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H01R13/533 (EP,US);
H01R13/5221 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/41] | H01R13/533 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/41] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ElektrischerVerbinder mit Antischwingungsvorrichtung | [1998/41] | English: | Electrical connector with anti-chattering interconnection means | [1998/41] | French: | Connecteur électrique ayant des dispositifs antivibratoires | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95113185.3 / EP0698946 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2002 | SE | 17.07.2002 | GB | 22.08.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2004/21] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 17.04.2002 | |
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 17.04.2002 | |
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 17.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0477520 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1 * column 6, line 24 - line 40 * * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 6 * * column 12, line 4 - column 13, line 57; figures 3,4,9 *; | [YA]EP0536708 (MOLEX INC [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 58; figures 1,2 * [A] 6; | [A]US5328382 (PAWLICKI JEFFREY J [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7 * column 3, line 15 - line 25 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 51; figures 1,2 * |