EP0875962 - Connector with switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harting KGaA Postfach 11 33 32325 Espelkamp / DE | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harting, Dietmar, Dipl. Kaufm. Schweriner Strasse 31 32339 Espelkamp / DE | 02 /
Pape, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Sundernstrasse 75a 32130 Enger / DE | 03 /
Weichert, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Geistwall 35 32312 Lübbecke / DE | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 98106017.1 | 02.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | DE1997118231 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19718231 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875962 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875962 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/703 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
H01R13/7032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schalterstecker | [1998/45] | English: | Connector with switch | [1998/45] | French: | Connecteur avec interrupteur | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.08.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2005/21] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 28.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9315535 (AUGAT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 10 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 2 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5601442 (HARTING DIETMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 57 * * figures 1-4 * |