EP0870523 - Skate track made from individual elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rudolph, Eva, Dipl.-Ing. Auf der Schanz 3 88161 Lindenberg / DE | For all designated states Rudolph, Hermann Auf der Schanz 3 88161 Lindenberg / DE | [1998/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106025.4 | 02.04.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | DE19971014086 | 07.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19714086 | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0870523 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0870523 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63C19/10, E01C13/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A63C19/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | A63C19/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [2000/38] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Skate-Anlage aus Einzelelementen | [1998/42] | English: | Skate track made from individual elements | [1998/42] | French: | Piste pour patins fabriquée à partir d'éléments uniques | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE29710266U (RUDOLPH EVA DIPL ING [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9010527U (PLAYPARC GMBH) [A] 1,4 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0378725 |