EP0928687 - Printing press blanket cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munz, Richard 14, rue du Jura 68440 Zimmersheim / FR | [1999/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Börjes-Pestalozza, Henrich, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Schmitt, Maucher & Partner Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106216.9 | 05.04.1998 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | DE1997222183U | 16.12.1997 Original published format: DE 29722183 U | [1999/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928687 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928687 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00, B41F35/06 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
B41F35/06 (EP);
B41P2235/23 (EP);
B41P2235/26 (EP);
B41P2235/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/12] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gummituchreinigungsvorrichtung in einer Druckmaschine | [1999/28] | English: | Printing press blanket cleaner | [1999/28] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage du blanchet dans une presse d'impression | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 17.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES | 10.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/05] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 28.05.2003 | |
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4555989 (MARASS JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column A; figure -; claim 1 * * column 5, line 22 - line 66 * [Y] 8-10; | [A]EP0369565 (BALDWIN TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [Y]EP0419289 (OXY DRY CORP [US]) [Y] 10 * column A; figure - * * column 11, line 2 - line 28 * * column 17, line 39 - column 19, line 27 *; | [Y]DE4412821 (KBA PLANETA AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * column A; figure - * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 10 *; | [A]EP0693378 (BALDWIN GEGENHEIMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,6,7* column A; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0747219 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 9 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 3 - line 24 * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 48 * |