EP0872678 - Tube joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8659 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8659 / JP | ||
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8659 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukano, Yoshihiro, c/o SMC Kabushiki Kaisha Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr. 2.2, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara -mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Tetsuro, c/o SMC Kabushiki Kaisha Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr 2.2, Kinunodai 4-chome Yawara -mura, Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | [2003/17] |
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
Fukano, Yoshihiro, c/o SMC Kabushiki Kaisha Tsukub a Gijutsu Center 2.2, Kinunodai 4-chome, Yawara-mu ra Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | ||
02 /
Maruyama, Tetsuro, c/o SMC Kabushiki Kaisha Tsukub a Gijutsu Center 2.2, Kinunodai 4-chome, Yawara-mu ra Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | |||
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
Fukano, Yoshihiro, c/o SMC K.K. Tsubuka Gijutsu Center 2.2, Kinunodai 4-chome, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | ||
02 /
Maruyama, Tetsuro, c/o SMC K.K. Tsukuba Gijutsu Center 2.2, Kinunodai 4-chome, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | |||
Former [1998/43] | 01 /
Fukano, Yoshihiro, c/o SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 2-2, Kinunodai 4-chome, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | ||
02 /
Maruyama, Tetsuro, c/o SMC Kabushiki Kaisha 2-2, Kinunodai 4-chome, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106296.1 | 07.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | JP19970096252 | 14.04.1997 Original published format: JP 9625297 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872678 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872678 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/04, F16L47/04, F16L19/028, F16L33/22 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
F16L19/04 (EP,US);
F16L19/028 (EP,US);
F16L33/223 (EP,US);
F16L47/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rohrverbindung | [1998/43] | English: | Tube joint | [1998/43] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2510886 (MATTES ROLF) [X] 1 * page 4, line 12 - page 4, line 16; figures 1,2 * [A] ; | [X]FR2373012 (DROUVIN ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 28; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0365821 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [A] 1,5,7* column 10, line 3 - column 10, line 11; figure 3 *; | [A]US5388871 (SAITOH MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0720471U |