Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0872513
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
06.05.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
14.05.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
11.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.03.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.10.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.08.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.04.2003 |
First examination report |
|
27.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.07.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.05.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] |
04.09.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
04.09.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |