EP0872357 - Core of a spoke for spoked wheel, spoke and bicycle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAVIC S.A. Le Ripel 01990 Saint-Trivier sur Moignans / FR | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mercat, Jean-Pierre Le Bourg 01990 Chaneins / FR | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Lejeune, Benoît Salomon S.A.S D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Lejeune, Benoit Salomon S.A. D.J.P.I. 74996 Annecy Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98106463.7 | 08.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | FR19970004862 | 16.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9704862 | [1998/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872357 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60B5/02, B60B1/00 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B60B1/003 (EP);
B60B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, PT [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kern einer Speiche für Speichenrad, Speiche und Rad eines Fahrrads | [1998/43] | English: | Core of a spoke for spoked wheel, spoke and bicycle wheel | [1998/43] | French: | Ame d'un rayon pour roue à rayons, rayon et roue de bicyclette | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9113771 (JOHNSON HAROLD M [US]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 6 - line 8; figure - *; | [A]US5540485 (ENDERS MARK L [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 35 - column 10, line 35; figure - *; | [A]US3768334 (DITLINGER R) [A] 1 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 56; figure - *; | [A]DE4425592 (HMS ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 61; figure - *; | [A]FR2586378 (VIELLARD PAUL HENRI [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4; figure - *; | [A]US5350221 (PEARCE TERRY V [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 9; figure - * | by applicant | WO9113771 |