Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3792041B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2006 | B2 | JPH10341036 | 22.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9067597 | 09.04.1997 | JP7529598 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6593159 | 15.07.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9067597 | 09.04.1997 | US53206300 | 21.03.2000 | US5650098 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0871228 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2001 | A3 | EP0871228 | 14.10.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP9067597 | 09.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6069394 | 30.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9067597 | 09.04.1997 |