EP0874268 - Fresnel lens sheet and rear projection screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Katsunori, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106727.5 | 14.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | JP19970094028 | 11.04.1997 Original published format: JP 9402897 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874268 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874268 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/62 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
G03B21/625 (EP,US);
H04N5/72 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, NL [1999/27] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fresnellinsen-Folie und Durchlicht-Projektionsschirm | [1998/44] | English: | Fresnel lens sheet and rear projection screen | [1998/44] | French: | Feuille à lentille de Fresnel et écran à rétroprojection | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH07219053 ; | [XA]JPS56147140 ; | [A]US4824227 (GOLDENBERG JILL F [US], et al) [A] 1-9* abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07219053 A 19950818 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5-9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820217), vol. 006, no. 027, Database accession no. (P - 102), & JP56147140 A 19811114 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5-9 |