EP0872832 - Skew adjustment mechanism for an optical pick-up used in an optical disc drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furukawa, Ken'ichi c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Imi, Kazutomo c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Teranishi, Kouji c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Manabe, Satoru c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106928.9 | 16.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | JP19970115156 | 17.04.1997 Original published format: JP 11515697 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872832 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872832 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/095, G11B7/08 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
G11B17/056 (EP,US);
G11B7/082 (EP,US);
G11B7/08582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der Schräge des optischen Abtastkopfes eines Plattenspielers | [1998/43] | English: | Skew adjustment mechanism for an optical pick-up used in an optical disc drive | [1998/43] | French: | Méchanisme d'ajustement de l'inclinaison d'une tête optique d'un lecteur de disque | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 31.03.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 17.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6257130 ; | [XA]JPS63183628 ; | [XA]JPH02189720 ; | [X]JPS6282519 ; | [A]JPS6228936 ; | [A]JPS61188744 ; | [A]EP0538824 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 8* figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0649130 (KENWOOD CORP [JP]) [A] 8 * figures 4,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870815), vol. 011, no. 252, Database accession no. (P - 605), & JP62057130 A 19870312 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881205), vol. 012, no. 460, Database accession no. (P - 795), & JP63183628 A 19880729 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * [A] 5 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901016), vol. 014, no. 474, Database accession no. (P - 1117), & JP02189720 A 19900725 (PIONEER ELECTRON CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [A] 5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870917), vol. 011, no. 287, Database accession no. (P - 617), & JP62082519 A 19870416 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870707), vol. 011, no. 208, Database accession no. (P - 593), & JP62028936 A 19870206 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870116), vol. 011, no. 015, Database accession no. (P - 536), & JP61188744 A 19860822 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 5 * abstract * |