EP0952198 - Precoating type adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THREE BOND CO., LTD. 1456, Hazama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states THREE BOND CO., LTD. 1456, Hazama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Satoshi, c/o THREE BOND CO., LTD. 1456, Hazama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107157.4 | 20.04.1998 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952198 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952198 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J4/06, C08F290/14, C09J4/00, C08F222/10, F16B39/22 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
C08F290/147 (EP,US);
C09J4/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2984 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2985 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2987 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J4/00, C08F220/00 (EP,US);
C09J4/00, C08F222/1067 (US,EP);
C09J4/06, C08F290/147 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/27] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klebstoff Zusammensetzung zur Grundierung | [1999/43] | English: | Precoating type adhesive composition | [1999/43] | French: | Composition adhésive pour revêtement primaire | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH10130587 ; | [YD]JPH07331187 ; | [Y]US4417028 (AZEVEDO MAX [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 23 - line 60 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 57 * * example - * * claim - ** JP-A-57192476 (cat. D) *; | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 98-343523, XP002078085 & JPH10130587 A 19980519 (TOKYO THREE BOND CO. LTD.) [XP] 1-16 * abstract * | [YD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 96-075218, XP002078096 & JPH07331187 A 19951219 (TOKYO THREE BOND CO. LTD.) [YD] 1-16 * abstract * |