Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4268723B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2009 | B2 | JP2000054909 | 22.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP98107220 | 21.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0953758 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2003 | B1 | EP0953758 | 03.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98107220 | 21.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59809865D1 | 13.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP98107220 | 21.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6173693 | 16.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP98107220 | 21.04.1998 |