EP0874240 - Enzyme-labeled immunoassay and device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujirebio Inc. 62-5, Hama-cho 2-chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Fujirebio Inc. 62-5, Hama-cho 2-chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashihara, Yoshihiro c/o Fujirebio Inc., 62-5, Hama-cho 2-chome Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Isomura, Mitsuo c/o Fujirebio Inc., 62-5, Hama-cho 2-chome Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sato, Atsuka c/o Fujirebio Inc., 62-5, Hama-cho 2-chome Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/44] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107362.0 | 22.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | JP19970118646 | 23.04.1997 Original published format: JP 11864697 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874240 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874240 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/542, G01N33/543, G01N33/535, // C12Q1/42, C12Q1/28, C12Q1/54 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/581 (EP,US);
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S436/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/27] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Enzym-markierter Immunoassay und Behelf hierfür | [1998/44] | English: | Enzyme-labeled immunoassay and device therefor | [1998/44] | French: | Essai immunologique marqué par enzyme et dispositif pour cela | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 29.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.05.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | FI | 31.07.2002 | GR | 31.07.2002 | DK | 31.10.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | PT | 14.11.2002 | GB | 22.04.2003 | IE | 22.04.2003 | LU | 22.04.2003 | ES | 23.04.2003 | CH | 30.04.2003 | LI | 30.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2005/21] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
GB | 22.04.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
LU | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
GB | 22.04.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
LU | 22.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
GB | 22.04.2003 | ||
IE | 22.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
GB | 22.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0271731 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-14; | [A]WO8808536 (BOOTS CELLTECH DIAGNOSTICS [GB])[A] 1-14; | [A]EP0354548 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-14; | [AD]EP0512390 (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) [AD] 1-14 |