EP0875536 - Addition reaction-curing silicone elastomer compositions,process for their production, process for the production of composite mouldings and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Falkenberg 1 40699 Erkrath / DE | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesch, Klaus-Dieter Rüttersweg 83 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Rist, Stefan Imbach 3 B 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Steinberger, Helmut, Dr. Winand-Rossi-Strasse 36 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Wrobel, Dieter, Dr. Saarlauterner Strasse 6 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/43] |
Former [1999/29] | Leifert, Elmar, Dr., et al Böhm Rauch Krämer Leifert Burgplatz 21/22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/27] | Leifert, Elmar, Dr., et al Böhm Rauch Schumacher Krämer & Leifert Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107410.7 | 23.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | DE19971018521 | 02.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19718521 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875536 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875536 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875536 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [1998/45] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/02] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Additionsvernetzende Siliconkautschukmischungen, ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, Verfahren zur Herstellung von Verbund-Formteilen und deren Verwendung | [1998/45] | English: | Addition reaction-curing silicone elastomer compositions,process for their production, process for the production of composite mouldings and their use | [1998/45] | French: | Compositions d'élastomères de silicone réticulables par réaction addition, leur procédé de préparation, procédé de préparation de piéces moulées en matériau composite et leur utilisation | [2003/27] |
Former [1998/45] | Compositons d'élastomères de silicone réticulables par réaction addition, leur procédé de préparation, procédé de préparation de piéces moulées en matériau composite et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 16.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 29.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2004
28.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Renner, Thomas Wacker-Chemie GmbH Patente Marken Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2004
28.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Renner, Thomas Wacker-Chemie GmbH Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2004
WACKER-CHEMIE GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Renner, Thomas, Dr. Wacker-Chemie GmbH Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hans-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81727 München / DE | 31.01.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.05.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.10.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.11.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.03.2004 | FR | 24.03.2004 | GB | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | AT | 23.04.2004 | BE | 30.04.2004 | CH | 30.04.2004 | LI | 30.04.2004 | DK | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
FR | 24.03.2004 | ||
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
AT | 23.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
AT | 23.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
FR | 11.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
FR | 11.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0459464 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1,3,5,6* example 1 *; | [DA]EP0503975 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1-9 * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, line 30 - line 34 * * claims 1,10,11 *; | [A]EP0768342 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 9 - line 23 * * page 4, line 10 - line 54 * * example - * * claims 1,11 * |