Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0877069
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.05.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
27.04.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
02.03.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
12.05.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
26.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.07.1999 |
First examination report |
|
25.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.06.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] |
25.09.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] |
25.09.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] |