Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4060440B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2008 | B2 | JPH10316947 | 02.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19719647 | 09.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0877069 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2000 | B1 | EP0877069 | 11.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19719647 | 09.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19719647 | 12.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19719647 | 09.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59800183D1 | 03.08.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19719647 | 09.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2149029T | 16.10.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19719647 | 09.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6063494 | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19719647 | 09.05.1997 |