EP0877069 - Heat curable adhesive foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [1998/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schümann, Uwe, Dr. Hollandweg 26A 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 02 /
Weiland, Kirstin Fanny-Lewald-Ring 99 21035 Hamburg / DE | [1998/46] | Application number, filing date | 98107488.3 | 24.04.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | DE1997119647 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719647 | [1998/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0877069 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877069 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00, C08L101/06 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C09J2421/00 (EP,US);
C09J2495/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1999/29] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermisch härtbare, haftklebrige Folie | [1998/46] | English: | Heat curable adhesive foil | [1998/46] | French: | Film adhésive thermodurcissable | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 28.09.2000 | SE | 28.09.2000 | [2001/27] |
Former [2001/16] | PT | 28.09.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60123574 ; | [A]JPS5144137 ; | [DA]EP0356715 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 32, Database accession no. 85-194723, XP002073726 & JPS60123574 A 00000000 (HAYAKAWA GUM KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 76, no. 22, Database accession no. 76-40920X, XP002073727 & JPS5144137 A 00000000 (CI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |