EP0874280 - Mask for producing three-dimensional laminated objects, mask-producing method ans mask-employing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Yukio c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Ozaki, Motoaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107572.4 | 24.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | JP19970109115 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10911597 | JP19980047649 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4764998 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0874280 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0874280 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874280 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, B41N1/24, B29C67/00, G03F1/16, G03F7/00, G03F1/14 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
G03F7/12 (EP,US);
B29C67/00 (KR);
B29C35/08 (KR);
B29C64/129 (EP,US);
B29C64/165 (EP,US);
G03F7/0035 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/44] | G03F1/00, B41N1/24, B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/12] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Maske zur Herstellung von laminierten dreidimensionalen Gegenstände, sowie dessen Herstellungs- und Gebrauchsverfahren | [1998/44] | English: | Mask for producing three-dimensional laminated objects, mask-producing method ans mask-employing method | [1998/44] | French: | Masque pour la production d'objets laminés tridimensionnels, méthodes pour sa fabrication et son utilisation | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6490749 ; | [XY]EP0470705 (CUBITAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-3 * column 10, line 15 - column 11, line 39; figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0588580 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [Y] 5 * figure 2 *; | [PA]EP0776713 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890711), vol. 013, no. 299, Database accession no. (M - 847), & JP01090749 A 19890407 (KENSEIDOU KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,6 * abstract * |