EP0882668 - Supporting stand for a beverage container like a keg [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wipfler, Wolfgang Eichendorfstrasse 23 68167 Mannheim / DE | [1998/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Mierswa, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107591.4 | 26.04.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | DE1997117534 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19717534 | DE1998118524 | 24.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19818524 | [1998/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0882668 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0882668 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
B67D1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1999/34] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme eines Getränkebehälters, wie Partyfass oder Gebinde | [1998/50] | English: | Supporting stand for a beverage container like a keg | [1998/50] | French: | Dispositif de support pour un conteneur de boisson comme un fût | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 17.06.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, IE, LU, MC, SE | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/24] | 22.12.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.07.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4213196 (WEIDT KARL ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 16; figures 1,6 *; | [A]DE29618122U (SCHERBINSKE GUENTHER [DE]); | [A]FR334510 (FRANZ MORGENSTERN [FR]); | [A]US4350267 (NELSON RICHARD E, et al); | [A]US1445058 (EUGENE APPEL) | by applicant | DE8317149U | DE3909109 | DE8907220U | FR1090541 |