EP0877421 - Sputter deposition and annealing of copper alloy metallization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/46] | Sputter deposition and annealing of copper alloy metallization M | ||
[1999/08] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue P.O. Box 450A Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue, P.O. Box 450A Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiang, Tony 100 N. Whisman Road No. 17 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
Ding, Peijun 1020 W. Riverside Way San Jose, California 95129 / US | 03 /
Chin, Barry 13174 Cumberland Drive Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 04 /
Hashim, Imran 1995-F Barrymore Common Fremont, California 94538 / US | 05 /
Sun, Bingxi 1271-179 Vicente Drive Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Käck, Jürgen, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | ||
Former [1998/46] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108387.6 | 08.05.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | US19970853191 | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 853191 | US19970878143 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: US 878143 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0877421 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0877421 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L21/3205 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
H01L21/76843 (EP,US);
H01L21/203 (KR);
C23C14/024 (EP,US);
C23C14/025 (EP,US);
C23C14/16 (EP,US);
C23C14/165 (EP,US);
C23C16/0281 (EP,US);
C23C16/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/28556 (EP,US);
H01L21/76831 (EP,US);
H01L21/76834 (EP,US);
H01L21/76867 (EP,US);
H01L21/76871 (EP,US);
H01L21/76877 (EP,US);
H01L21/76888 (EP,US);
H01L23/53233 (EP,US);
H01L23/53238 (EP,US);
H01L21/2855 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/36] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zerstaubungsabscheidung und Temperen von Metallisierung aus Kupferlegierung | [1998/46] | English: | Sputter deposition and annealing of copper alloy metallization | [1999/08] | French: | Dépôt par pulvérisation et recuit d'une métallisation comportant un alliage de cuivre | [1998/46] |
Former [1998/46] | Sputter deposition and annealing of copper alloy metallization M | Examination procedure | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/13] | 02.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0725439 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,11,12,17-19,25,26 * page 38, line 15 - line 53; figures 1,2; table 18 *; | [A]EP0508156 (IBM [US]) [A] 20,23 * abstract *; | [PX]US5747360 (NULMAN JAIM [US]) [PX] 1-3,11,13,17-19,21,25,26 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 30; figure 2; claims 3,13 * | [A] - GUTMANN R J ET AL, "INTEGRATION OF COPPER MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTS WITH OXIDE AND POLYMER INTERLEVEL DIELECTRICS", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19951201), vol. 270, no. 1/02, pages 472 - 479, XP000595253 [A] 13-16,20-24 * page 475, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(96)80080-0 | [AD] - LANFORD W A ET AL, "LOW-TEMPERATURE PASSIVATION OF COPPER BY DOPING WITH AL OR MG", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19950615), vol. 262, no. 1/02, pages 234 - 241, XP000517383 [AD] 13-16,20-24 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)05837-0 | [A] - MURARKA S P ET AL, "Copper interconnection schemes: Elimination of the need of diffusion barrier/adhesion promoter by the use of corrosion resistant, low resistivity doped copper", MICROELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY AND PROCESS INTEGRATION, AUSTIN, TX, USA, 20-21 OCT. 1994, ISSN 0277-786X, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1994, USA, vol. 2335, pages 80 - 90, XP002079899 [A] 13-16,21-24 * abstract * * page 84, paragraphs 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.186047 |