EP0882918 - Thermally actuated safety valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metallwerke Otto Dingerkus GmbH Auf dem Schilde 57439 Attendorn / DE | [1998/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartung, Karl-Heinz Am Hahnbeul 6 57439 Attendorn / DE | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108399.1 | 08.05.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | DE19972009965U | 07.06.1997 Original published format: DE 29709965 U | [1998/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0882918 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0882918 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/38 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
F16K17/38 (EP);
F16K17/383 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/51] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermisch betätigbares Sicherheitsventil | [1998/50] | English: | Thermally actuated safety valve | [1998/50] | French: | Soupape de sûreté actionnée thermiquement | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2304013 (HARTMANN & BRAUN AG) [X] 1-8,11-14 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 9,15-21; | [XA]EP0131782 (SINGER CO) [X] 1,5,13,17 * figures 2,3 * [A] 4,15,16,18; | [XA]GB1033612 (UNITED GAS INDUSTRIES) [X] 1 * page 4, line 70 - line 72; figures 3-6 * [A] 9-11; | [XA]DE4131859 (MERTIK REGELUNGSTECHNIK GMBH) [X] 1,17,20 * figure 1; claim 2 * [A] 18,19,21; | [DA]DE29511991U (METALLWERKE OTTO DINGERKUS GMB) |