EP0956867 - Use of flavonoid glycosides, tanning agents and microorganisms for the therapy and prophylaxis of diabetes mellitus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebel, Franz-Peter, Dr. Am Petersberg 61 D-33619 Bielefeld / DE | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 98108560.8 | 12.05.1998 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956867 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/70, A61K31/35, A61K35/78 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/704 (EP);
A61K31/22 (EP);
A61K31/35 (EP);
A61K31/366 (EP);
A61K31/404 (EP);
A61K31/475 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung von Flavonoidglykosiden, Gerbstoffen und Mikroorganismen zur Therapie und Prophylaxe des Diabetes mellitus | [1999/46] | English: | Use of flavonoid glycosides, tanning agents and microorganisms for the therapy and prophylaxis of diabetes mellitus | [1999/46] | French: | Utilisation de glycosides de flavonoides, de tanins et de microorganismes pour le traitement et la prophylaxie du diabète sucré | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/24] | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0402049 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB) [X] 1,8 * page 6, line 4 - line 12; claims 17-19 *; | [X]JPH03240725 ; | [X]JPH0840923 ; | [X]CN1124287 ; | [X]JPH09187230 ; | [X]JPH03232851 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 49, Database accession no. 91-358398, XP002081613 & JPH03240725 A 19911028 (SENJU PHARM CO) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 16, Database accession no. 96-157018, XP002081614 & JPH0840923 A 19960213 (NAKANO M) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 47, Database accession no. 97-504325, XP002081615 & CN1124287 A 19960612 (SHU Z) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 39, Database accession no. 97-419359, XP002081616 & JPH09187230 A 19970722 (NIPPON FLOUR MILLS CO LTD) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - CHERIAN S ET AL, "Antidiabetic effect of a glycoside of pelargonidin isolated from the bark of Ficus bengalensis Linn.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, XP002081612 [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [ ] - INDIAN J BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, AUG 1992, 29 (4) P380-2, INDIA | [X] - JEAN T. ET AL, "Mediators involved in inflammation: Effects of Daflon 500 mg on their release", ANGIOLOGY, 1994, 45/6 SUPPL. (554-559), USA, XP002081607 [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - LACOMBE C. ET AL, "Activity of Daflon 500 mg on the hemorheological disorders in diabetes", INT. ANGIOL., 1989, 8/4 SUPPL. (45-48), Italy, XP002081608 [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - BEHAR A. ET AL, "Capillary filtration and lymphatic resorption in diabetes. Application to the pharmacodynamic activity of Daflon 500 mg", INT. ANGIOL., 1989, 8/4 SUPPL. (27-29), Italy, XP002081609 [X] 1,8 * page 29, column 2, paragraph 4 * | [X] - LACOMBE C. ET AL, "Hemorheological improvement after Daflon 500 mg treatment in diabetes", INT. ANGIOL., 1988, 7/2 SUPPL. (21-24), Italy, XP002081610 [X] 1,8 * page 23, column 2, paragraph 7 - page 24, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [X] - BOUSKELA E ET AL, "Effects of oral administration of purified micronized flavonoid fraction on increased microvascular permeability induced by various agents and on ischemia/reperfusion in diabetic hamsters.", INT J MICROCIRC CLIN EXP, NOV-DEC 1995, 15 (6) P293-300, SWITZERLAND, XP002081611 [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920114), vol. 016, no. 013, Database accession no. (C - 0901), & JP03232851 A 19911016 (NIPPON FLOUR MILLS CO LTD) [X] 1,8 * abstract * |