Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0878689
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
28.09.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] |
06.10.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
01.09.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.08.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
31.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.05.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
15.05.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.04.2000 |
First examination report |
|
11.04.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.04.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
17.03.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
16.03.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
17.12.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
08.10.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
04.10.1999 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
09.07.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
09.07.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
02.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] |