EP0878782 - Apparatus for handling sheet-like objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI SEIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 24-15, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states ASAHI SEIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 24-15, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehara, Takashi 1-11, Koyasucho 2-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108635.8 | 12.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | JP19970159101 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 15910197 | JP19970161776 | 16.05.1997 Original published format: JP 16177697 | JP19970164849 | 20.05.1997 Original published format: JP 16484997 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0878782 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878782 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/00 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
B65H29/06 (EP,US);
B65H29/51 (EP,US);
B65H39/105 (EP,US);
G07D11/12 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1999/30] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Handhaben von Blattgut | [1999/25] | English: | Apparatus for handling sheet-like objects | [1998/47] | French: | Dispositif pour traiter des feuilles | [1998/47] |
Former [1998/47] | Vorrichtung zum Behandeln von Blattgut | Examination procedure | 12.05.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0395047 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 34; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,7; | [YA]EP0581102 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 6, line 55 - column 9, line 4; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-3,6,8; | [YA]DE19500899 (IBM [US]) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 6; figure 2 * [A] 1-4,8; | [XA]US4470590 (ARIGA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 3,5-7 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 41; figures 3-5 * [A] 1,2 | by applicant | JPH0632514 |