EP0897058 - Internal combustion engine piston [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Burscheid GmbH Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 51399 Burscheid / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states AE GOETZE GmbH Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 D-51399 Burscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junge, Klaus, Prof. Weislingenstr. 24 13465 Berlin / DE | [1999/07] | Application number, filing date | 98108682.0 | 13.05.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | DE1997134654 | 11.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19734654 | [1999/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897058 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897058 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/00, F16J1/16 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
F16J1/16 (EP);
F02F3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/07] | F02F3/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/34] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kolben für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1999/07] | English: | Internal combustion engine piston | [1999/07] | French: | Piston pour un moteur à combustion interne | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/14] | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2180321 (FORD MOTOR CO) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 30; figure - *; | [Y]GB190487 (EDMONDO MICHELE BORGO) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 43 - line 53; figure - *; | [A]GB946733 (HEPWORTH & GRANDAGE LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 14 - line 24; figure - *; | [DA]FR2534343 (FLOQUET MONOPOLE SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 7, line 36; figure - * | by applicant | FR2534343 |