EP0865789 - Pharmaceutical compositions for intranasal administration of dihydroergotamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merkus, Franciscus Wilhelmus Henricus Maria Grootreesdijk 26 B-2460 Kasterlee / BE | [1998/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98109002.0 | 18.03.1994 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | BE19930000297 | 26.03.1993 Original published format: BE 9300297 | BE19930000298 | 26.03.1993 Original published format: BE 9300298 | BE19930000299 | 26.03.1993 Original published format: BE 9300299 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865789 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865789 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865789 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/48, A61K47/36, A61K47/40, A61K9/00, A61K47/26, A61K47/48, A61P25/06 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K31/48 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K47/40 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | A61K31/48, A61K47/36, A61K47/40, A61K31/485, A61K9/00, A61K47/26, A61K47/48 | ||
Former IPC [1998/39] | A61K31/48, A61K9/00, A61K47/26, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen zur intranasalen Verabreichung von Dihydroergotamin | [1998/39] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions for intranasal administration of dihydroergotamine | [1998/39] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques pour une administration intranasale de dihydroergotamine | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94911944.0 / EP0689438 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 18.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/17] | MC | 31.03.2005 | |
LU | 16.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | MC | 31.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1592563 (SANDOZ LTD) [X] 1,2,6-10 * example 5; claims 1,11,21 *; | [X]EP0463653 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * col.3, l.9-15; col.5, l.47; col.7, l.4-24; col.8, l.32-39 *; | [X]US5169849 (KIECHEL JEAN-RENE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * col.2, l.26-62; col.5, l.13-18, l.59-62; col.8, l.38-48; claims 28 and 29 *; | [A] - HERMENS ET AL, "Der Einfluss von Arzneimitteln auf die Bewegung nasaler Flimmerhaare", DEUTSCHE APOTHEKER ZEITUNG, (19901101), vol. 130, no. 44, pages 2411 - 15, XP000159385 [A] 1-10 * page 2414, column 3, paragraph 1 - page 2415, paragraph 1 * |