blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0883264

EP0883264 - Datatransmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harting KGaA
Postfach 11 33
32325 Espelkamp / DE
[1998/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Harting, Dietmar, Dipl.
Schweriner Strasse 31
32339 Espelkamp / DE
02 / Coors, Erich, Dipl.-Ing.
Weimarer Weg 4
32339 Espelkamp / DE
03 / Nowack, Dietmar
Masurenweg 2
32339 Espelkamp / DE
[1998/50]
Application number, filing date98109296.822.05.1998
[1998/50]
Priority number, dateDE199712327404.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19723274
[1998/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0883264
Date:09.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/437, B60R16/02
[1998/50]
CPC:
H04B1/205 (EP); H04L12/437 (EP); B60R16/0315 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/33]
Former [1998/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenübertragungssystem[1998/50]
English:Datatransmission system[1998/50]
French:Système de transmission de données[1998/50]
Examination procedure18.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/11]
01.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/24]
14.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2175775  (STC PLC) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4739183  (TOKURA NORIHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, column 1, line 24 - line 33 * * column 3, line 24 - line 57 ** column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 10 *;
 [A]EP0609579  (D2B SYSTEMS CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [Y]  - GRELLA G, "OPTICS IS TRUMPS: FIBER-OPTIC CONNECTIONS FOR USE IN MOTOR VEHICLES", ELEKTRONIK PRAXIS, VOGEL-VERLAG, GERMANY, (19960607), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 74 - 78, XP002075166 [Y] 1 * page 74, column L, line 33 - column M, line 44 * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - JOSHI S P, "The fiber distributed data interface: a bright future ahead", 1986 PROCEEDINGS OF THE FALL JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE, DALLAS, TX, USA, (19861102), pages 504 - 512, XP002075167 [A] 1,2 * page 507, column R, line 1 - page 508, column L, line 20 * * figure 3 *
 [A]  - HAFNER E ET AL, "Enhancing the availability of a loop system by meshing", 1976 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, ZURICH, SWITZERLAND, (19760309), pages D4.1 - D4.5, XP002075168 [A] 1,4 * page D4.1, column L, line 51 - line 55 * * page D4.2, column R, line 8 - page D4.3, column L, line 9 * * figure 2.4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.