blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0960835

EP0960835 - Shelf storage, in particular a roof and wall supporting high shelf storage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEDCON MAGAZIJNINRICHTING B.V.
Nijverheidsweg 26
NL-7000 AA Doetinchem / NL
[1999/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Hollander, Rudolf Richard
Wildenborchseweg 10
7251 KC Vorden / NL
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Christophersen & Partner Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Patentanwälte
Kapellstrasse 12
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/35]Christophersen & Partner
Patentanwälte Kapellstrasse 12
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/48]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98109721.528.05.1998
[1999/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0960835
Date:01.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0960835
Date:09.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:B65G1/02, A47B47/00
[1999/48]
CPC:
A47B47/027 (EP); B65G1/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL [2000/32]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regallager, insbesondere dach- und wandtragendes Hochregallager[1999/48]
English:Shelf storage, in particular a roof and wall supporting high shelf storage[1999/48]
French:Magasin à rayonnage, en particulier magasin à rayonnage surélevé supportant un toit et un mur[1999/48]
Examination procedure07.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
18.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, MC, PT, SE
27.09.2001Fee for grant paid
27.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU28.05.2002
[2004/39]
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2435968  (SIEBAU) [Y] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * page 3, paragraph 3 *;
 [Y]US4102108  (CODY DAVID L) [Y] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * column 4, line 13 - line 33 *;
 [Y]EP0551202  (WARD BUILDING SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 6,9* figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.