EP0884344 - Mild surfactant compositions with copolymer polyaspartic acid derivatives for cosmetics or cleaning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [2000/15] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grüning, Burghard, Dr. Waldsaum 11 45134 Essen / DE | 02 /
Rau, Harald Moltkestrasse 134 45138 Essen / DE | 03 /
Simpelkamp, Jörg, Dr. Alexanderstrasse 35 45130 Essen / DE | 04 /
Weitemeyer, Christian, Dr. Sundernholz 67 45134 Essen / DE | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 98109730.6 | 28.05.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | DE1997124589 | 11.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19724589 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884344 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884344 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, C08L77/10, C11D3/37, C08G73/10, A61K7/06, A61K7/16, A61K7/50 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/3719 (EP);
A61K8/88 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
A61Q9/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | C08G73/10, C11D3/37, A61K7/06, A61K7/16, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/30] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Milde tensidhaltige Zubereitungen mit copolymeren Polyasparaginsäurederivaten für kosmetische oder Reinigungszwecke | [1998/51] | English: | Mild surfactant compositions with copolymer polyaspartic acid derivatives for cosmetics or cleaning | [1998/51] | French: | Préparations de tensio-actifs doux avec des dérivés de copolymères d'acide polyaspartique pour nettoyage ou cosmétique | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE19524097 (HENKEL KGAA) [DX] 1-4,9 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]CA2192256 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH) [A] 1-9 * examples 9-12; claims 1-11 *; | [DAP]DE19545678 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH) [DAP] 1-9 * examples 9-12; claims 1-11 *; | [AD]DE2253190 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [AD] 1-6,12 * examples 1-4; claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP0361202 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO) [A] 1,2,4 * examples 1-10; claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]FR2403076 (OREAL) [A] 1 * examples III,IV-X; claims 1-5 * |