EP0884040 - Needle therapy mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.M.P. Chinese Medical Products Trading GmbH Parz 2 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markarian, Karine, Dr. med. Antersdorf 32a 84359 Simbach am Inn / DE | 02 /
Hainzl, Udo Schloss Parz 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr. Patentanwalt, Münchener Strasse 80a 85221 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109784.3 | 29.05.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | DE1997210382U | 13.06.1997 Original published format: DE 29710382 U | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884040 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884040 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884040 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61H39/04, A61H39/08, A61H7/00 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
A61H39/04 (EP);
A61H2201/1284 (EP);
A61H2201/1695 (EP);
A61H2203/0456 (EP);
A61H7/001 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | A61H39/04, A61H39/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nadelreizmatte | [1998/51] | English: | Needle therapy mat | [1998/51] | French: | Natte stimulante à aiguilles | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 20.01.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.08.2003 | FI | 20.08.2003 | NL | 20.08.2003 | DK | 20.11.2003 | GR | 20.11.2003 | SE | 20.11.2003 | PT | 20.01.2004 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/31] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 20.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7048210U (THELEN & CO) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [YD]DE9301940U (PAVEL) [YD] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 31 * * page 10, line 21 - page 12, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5250067 (GELFER ALA [US], et al) [A] 1 *whole document*;; figures 2,3,6 *; | [Y]EP0630638 (GROSSMANN HELMUT [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-6 *; | [PA]EP0795310 (LOHNES OLEG [DE]) [PA] 1* figures 2-4; claims 1-4 * | by applicant | DE7012168U | DE7048210U | DE7310184U | US4421110 |