EP0889516 - Formation of sub-lithographic features [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Formation of sublithographic features | ||
[1999/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ploessl, Robert 11816 Park Forest Court Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109829.6 | 29.05.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970884732 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 884732 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889516 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889516 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889516 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H01L21/76801 (EP,US);
H01L21/28 (KR);
H01L21/76816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/26] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung von sub-lithographischen Strukturen | [1999/01] | English: | Formation of sub-lithographic features | [1999/41] | French: | Formation de structures sub-lithographique | [1999/01] |
Former [1999/01] | Formation of sublithographic features | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 14.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10107161 ; | [A]JPH09148430 ; | [A]US5506172 (TANG SANH [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 098, no. 009, & JP10107161 A 19980424 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 097, no. 010, & JP09148430 A 19970606 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |