EP0882507 - Process for preparing a noble metal supported shell-type catalyst for the synthesis of vinyl acetate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/50] | Noble metal supported shell-type catalyst, its manufactoring and its use for preparing vinyl acetate | ||
[2002/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH Lurgiallee 14 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states Celanese GmbH Lurgiallee 14 60439 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Aventis Research & Technologies GmbH & Co KG 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Hoechst Research & Technology Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagemeyer, Alfred, Dr. Gersthofer Strasse 11 65929 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Dingerdissen, Uwe, Dr. Linneweg 1 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
Kühlein, Klaus, Prof. Dr. Fasanenstrasse 41 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 04 /
Heitz, Johannes, Dr. Leopold-Figl-Strasse 38 4040 Linz / AT | 05 /
Bäuerle, Dieter, Prof. Dr. Oberklammerstrasse 47 4203 Altenberg / AT | [1998/50] | Application number, filing date | 98109835.3 | 29.05.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | DE1997123591 | 05.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19723591 | [1998/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882507 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882507 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/34, B01J23/40, B01J23/48, C07C67/055 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
B01J37/345 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
C07C67/055 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/055, C07C69/01 (EP,US);
C07C67/055, C07C69/15 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/33] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines edelmetallhaltigen Trägerschalenkatalysators zur Herstellung von Vinylacetat | [2002/09] | English: | Process for preparing a noble metal supported shell-type catalyst for the synthesis of vinyl acetate | [2002/09] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un catalyseur supporté à base de métal précieux déposé en surface, ledit catalyseur étant utilisé pour la préparation d'acétate de vinyle | [2002/09] |
Former [1998/50] | Edelmetallhaltiger Trägerschalenkatalysator, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung zur Herstellung von Vinylacetat | ||
Former [1998/50] | Noble metal supported shell-type catalyst, its manufactoring and its use for preparing vinyl acetate | ||
Former [1998/50] | Catalyseur supporté à base de métal précieux déposé en surface, son mode d'obtention et son utilisation dans la préparation d'acétate de vinyle | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 05.12.2000 | Appeal received | 05.12.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.01.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4264421 (BARD ALLEN J, et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * example - *; | [XA]US5185308 (BARTLEY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 9-12 * example - *[A] 1-8; | [X]US5260108 (BRAREN BODIL E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim - * |