Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0882395
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.05.2002 |
Refusal of application |
published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] |
17.01.2002 |
Application refused |
|
24.08.2001 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.07.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
11.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.06.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.01.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
08.10.1999 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
03.09.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.07.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
02.07.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |
11.06.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
23.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |