Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9729632 | Global Dossier | 21.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9600597 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000504582 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9700261 | 17.02.1997 | SE9600597 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0880313 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9700261 | 17.02.1997 | SE9600597 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1819197 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9700261 | 17.02.1997 | SE9600597 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE9600597D0 | 15.02.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9600597 | 15.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6109555 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9702130 | 05.06.1997 | SE9700261 | 17.02.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1146644 | Global Dossier | 23.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9702130 | 05.06.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0882395 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9702130 | 05.06.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE510814 | 28.06.1999 | C2 | SE9702130L | 06.12.1998 | L | SE9702130D0 | 05.06.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9702130 | 05.06.1997 |