EP0882559 - Method and apparatus for delivering labels and the like to a compression molding machine for molding plastic closures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaminski, Ronald S. 9180 Devil's Hole Road Bowling Green, OH 43402 / US | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109975.7 | 02.06.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | US19970867090 | 02.06.1997 Original published format: US 867090 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0882559 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0882559 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/12, B65C9/08, B29C51/16 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
B29C43/18 (EP,US);
B29C33/18 (EP,US);
B29C43/08 (EP,US);
B29C51/165 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3288 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3466 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3689 (EP,US);
B29C33/20 (EP,US);
B29L2031/565 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Fördern von Etiketten und dergleichen zu einer Formpresse für die Herstellung von Kunststoffverschlüssen | [1998/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for delivering labels and the like to a compression molding machine for molding plastic closures | [1998/50] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la distribution d'étiquettes et analogues à une presse de moulage pour mouler des couvercles en plastique | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, LU, MC | 01.03.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4801348 (TAKAGAKI NOBUYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6,8,10-12,16,18,20,21 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 54; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5223315 (KATSURA TADAHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6,8,10-12,16,18,20,21 * column 13, line 38 - column 14, line 53; figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0494539 (GRAHAM ENG CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 26 - column 9, line 43; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0591549 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-12,16,18-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5116452 (EDER ERICH [DE]) [A] 4-10,14-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US4795597 (WHITELEY NORMAN [GB], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5344305 (MCKILLIP BARRON G [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 54 - column 44 * * figures 1,4 * |