30.06.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
08.07.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
08.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
01.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.06.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.12.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.02.2004 |
First examination report |
|
11.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.11.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
06.10.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
06.10.2000 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
24.07.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
04.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.05.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
17.04.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
18.02.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |
17.02.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
14.01.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
11.06.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
30.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] |