EP0884071 - Gymnastic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kribben, Toni Louisenstrasse 29 50374 Erftstadt / DE | [2000/47] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Kribben, Toni Louisenstrasse 29 50374 Erftstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Kranz, Christoph Chlodwigpfad 1 52385 Nideggen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kribben, Toni Louisenstrasse 29 50374 Erftstadt / DE | 02 /
Kranz, Christoph Chlodwigpfad 1 52385 Nideggen / DE | [2000/47] |
Former [1998/51] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Freischem, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Freischem Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Freischem, Werner, et al Patentanwälte Freischem, An Gross St. Martin 2 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Freischem, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Freischem, An Gross St. Martin 2 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110122.3 | 03.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | DE1997210221U | 13.06.1997 Original published format: DE 29710221 U | DE1997213435U | 29.07.1997 Original published format: DE 29713435 U | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884071 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884071 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884071 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/055 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
A63B21/0552 (EP,US);
A63B2071/026 (EP,US);
A63B21/00069 (EP,US);
A63B21/0414 (EP,US);
A63B21/0442 (EP,US);
A63B21/0557 (EP,US);
A63B2208/0204 (EP,US);
A63B2208/0228 (EP,US);
A63B2208/0242 (EP,US);
A63B5/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/14] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gymnastikgerät | [1998/51] | English: | Gymnastic apparatus | [1998/51] | French: | Appareil de gymnastique | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 29.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE378520 (EDWIN MORVAL MULLIN); | [A]US3172660 (WALLACE JANET D, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US3345068 (BOWEN HAMILTON M) [A] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 18; figure - *; | [A]WO8101960 (ITO T) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4492376 (SCHATZ JACK M [US], et al) [A] 1,7,12 * column 3, line 29 - line 40; figure - * * column 4, line 50 - line 66 * * column 5, line 41 - line 53 * |