EP0882581 - Registration detection apparatus for imaging systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA CORPORATION 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | [2006/36] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Agfa Corporation 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation Agfa Division, 200 Ballardvale Street Wilmington, MA 01887-1069 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rombult, Philip A. 100 South Williams Street Bradford, MA 01835 / US | 02 /
Lennhoff, Akim 178A Harvard Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | De Niel, Marc Alfons Jozef Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate Intellectual Property Department 3800 Patent Administration Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | De Niel, Marc Alfons Jozef Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate Intellectual Property Department 3800 Patent Administration Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef, et al Agfa-Gevaert, Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1998/50] | Hofstetter, Alfons J., Dr.rer.nat., et al Strasse & Hofstetter, Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110169.4 | 04.06.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | US19970868969 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: US 868969 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0882581 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0882581 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882581 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41B21/32, G03F7/20, H04N1/08 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H04N1/0873 (EP,US);
B41B21/32 (EP,US);
H04N1/08 (EP,US);
H04N1/0882 (EP,US);
G03F9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/50] | B41B21/32, G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2001/46] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausrichtungerfassungsgerät für Bilderzeugungssystemen | [1998/50] | English: | Registration detection apparatus for imaging systems | [1998/50] | French: | Appareil de détection du positionnement pour des systèmes d'imagerie | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 29.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.09.2006 | FR | 06.09.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | BE | 06.09.2006 | |
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | BE | 06.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5619246 (STRAAYER RONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * column 7, line 33 - column 7, line 53; figures 2,3,6 * [A] 2,4-6,8-19; | [A]US5488906 (IRON GERA [IL], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 3; figures 4B,5 *; | [A]US4945238 (MURAISHI KATSUAKI [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |