EP0892280 - Method for operating an opto-electronic sensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/07] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Sick AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch, Breisgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alt, Gerhard Dorfstrasse 82 79350 Sexau / DE | 02 /
Bürger, Jürgen Im Lehle 28 79331 Nimburg / DE | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Finsterwald, Martin, Dr., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110211.4 | 04.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | DE19971030341 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19730341 | [1999/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0892280 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0892280 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892280 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US);
G06K7/10722 (EP);
G01S17/88 (EP);
G01S17/894 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/44] | G01S7/48, G01V8/20 | ||
Former IPC [1999/03] | G01S7/48 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI [2000/41] |
Former [2000/28] | |||
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer opto-elektronischen Sensoranordnung | [1999/03] | English: | Method for operating an opto-electronic sensor device | [1999/03] | French: | Procédé pour faire fonctionner un dispositif capteur opto-électronique | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2005
ADMISSIBLE ifm electronic gmbh Teichstrasse 4 D-45127 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2005
ADMISSIBLE ifm electronic gmbh Teichstrasse 4 D-45127 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 02.12.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.03.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/23] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 30.01.2008 | Appeal received No. T0333/08 | 10.04.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.03.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 22.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.03.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | [2011/38] |
Former [2006/12] | DK | 26.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0116284 (PIETZSCH LUDWIG [DE]) [Y] 1,5,8 * page 8, line 11 - line 31 * * page 6, line 15 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3413474 (BANGERTER FRED F, et al) [A] 1* page 17, line 4 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3701340 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0559357 (CSIR [ZA]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 19; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US5266810 (MURPHY WILLIAM J [US]) [Y] 1,5,8 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]US5629704 (THRONGNUMCHAI KRAISORN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19544632 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,5,8 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 54; figure 1 * |