EP0883212 - Connector engaging structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 1-4-28, Mita Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 1-4-28, Mita Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuji, Masanori, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-040 / JP | 02 /
Sugiyama, Osamu, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-040 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Tsuneyuki, c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110361.7 | 05.06.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | JP19970149372 | 06.06.1997 Original published format: JP 14937297 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0883212 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0883212 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0883212 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629, H01R12/02 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H01R13/62977 (EP,US);
H01R13/62911 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/50] | H01R13/629, H01R23/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/31] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungstruktur eines Verbinders | [1998/50] | English: | Connector engaging structure | [1998/50] | French: | Structure d'engagement d'un connecteur | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 08.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0736935 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0722203 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0717466 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0363804 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5562465 (TAGUCHI NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5474462 (YAMANASHI MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |