EP0883274 - Mobile communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Yoshitaka NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110370.8 | 05.06.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | JP19970149227 | 06.06.1997 Original published format: JP 14922797 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0883274 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0883274 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
H04W52/027 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/29] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationsendgerät | [1998/50] | English: | Mobile communication terminal | [1998/50] | French: | Terminal de communication mobile | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 30.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0682434 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 22 * * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 47 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5010566 (SEO MASAYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 15 * * column 2, line 31 - line 47 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 20 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2298499 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,5,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 28 * * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 30 * * figures 1-3 *; | [DA]JPH07170226 ; | [A]JPH07336417 ; | [A]JPH05227263 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07170226 A 19950704 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] 1,2,4,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07336417 A 19951222 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2,4,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931214), vol. 017, no. 680, Database accession no. (E - 1476), & JP05227263 A 19930903 (FUJITSU LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |