EP0884682 - Cache memory management method for real time operating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakisada, Emi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Yuji NEC IC Mic. Sys. Ltd., 403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110499.5 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | JP19970150627 | 09.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15062797 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884682 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884682 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
G06F12/0842 (EP,US);
G06F9/4843 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2001/50] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Cachespeicherverwaltungsverfahren für Echtzeit-Betriebssystem | [1998/51] | English: | Cache memory management method for real time operating system | [1998/51] | French: | Procédé de gestion d'antémémoire pour un système d'exploitation en temps réel | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 19.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4257097 (MORAN JOHN C) [X] 1-26 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [E]EP0856797 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [GB]) [E] 1-26 * abstract *; | [A]DE2509869 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-26 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |