EP0876065 - Autostereoscopic video device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIO, Pierre 81, rue de la Mare 75020 Paris / FR | [2000/37] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states ALLIO, Pierre 81, rue de la Mare F-75020 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98110519.0 | 26.04.1994 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | FR19930005380 | 05.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305380 | FR19930005381 | 05.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305381 | FR19930005384 | 05.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305384 | [1998/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876065 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876065 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N9/3141 (KR);
H04N13/10 (EP,US);
H04N13/15 (EP,US);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/229 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/32 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/346 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | Autostereoskopisches Videosystem | [1998/45] | English: | Autostereoscopic video device | [1998/45] | French: | Dispositif vidéo autostéréoscopique | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94914446.3 / EP0697160 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.09.2000 | SE | 13.12.2000 | [2002/27] |
Former [2001/27] | SE | 13.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3674921 (GOLDSMITH ALFRED NORTON) [X] 1,2,12 * column 9, line 20 - column 10, line 5; figures 17-19; claims 1-6 * [Y] 3-9; | [Y]EP0267000 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [Y] 4,5* claims 1-4 *; | [DY]US5099320 (ALLIO PIERRE Y J [FR]) [DY] 3,6-9 * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 8; figure 5 * * column 9, line 57 - column 11, line 3; figures 6,7; claim - * |