EP0884743 - Improved structure of push-button switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takenaka, Takuo 1406, Aza Dounooku Maizuru-shi, Kyoto, 625-0044 / JP | 02 /
Kudo, Yasuchika 25-9-5, Fukutani Obama-shi, Fukui-ken, 917-0001 / JP | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Morgan, James Garnet, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Morgan, James Garnet, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Morgan, James G., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110554.7 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | JP19970153349 | 11.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15334997 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884743 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884743 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884743 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/14, H01H13/12 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H01H13/12 (EP,US);
H01H13/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2000/15] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserte Struktur eines Drucktastenschalters | [1998/51] | English: | Improved structure of push-button switch | [1998/51] | French: | Structure améliorée d'un interrupteur à bouton-poussoir | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 19.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.05.2005 | IT | 25.05.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | IT | 25.05.2005 | |
FR | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2008/12] | IT | 25.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2346836 (ROGERO BERNARD [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5-8 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 26 *; | [Y]GB842485 (ELECTRICAL APPARATUS COMPANY I) [Y] 1,2,5-8 * page 4, line 65 - line 99 * |