EP0885915 - Polyorganosiloxanes having dialkoxyorganosiloxy groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [1999/18] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Hüls Silicone Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-01610 Nünchritz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheim, Uwe, Dr. rer. nat. Romerstrasse 4 01640 Coswig / DE | 02 /
Jenkner, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 8 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 03 /
Lehnert, Robert, Dr. rer. nat. Egon-Erwin-Kisch-Strasse 17 01069 Dresden / DE | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/18] |
Former [1998/52] | Zöllner, Gudrun Hüls Silicone GmbH D-01610 Nünchritz / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110603.2 | 10.06.1998 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | DE1997125518 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19725518 | [1998/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0885915 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0885915 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/26, C08G77/388, C08L83/04 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
C08G77/388 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/52] | C08G77/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/49] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, LI | ||
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polyorganosiloxane mit Dialkoxyorganosiloxy-Gruppen | [1998/52] | English: | Polyorganosiloxanes having dialkoxyorganosiloxy groups | [1998/52] | French: | Polyorganosiloxanes ayant des groupes dialkoxyorganosiloxy | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 31.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4460739 (ASHBY BRUCE A [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0242042 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] * page 3, line 11 - line 25 * * page 5, line 33 - line 56 *; | [A]EP0251270 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,15 * Seite 9, Formel (IV) ** claim - *; | [DA]US4772675 (KLOSOWSKI JEROME M [US], et al) [DA] 1,15 * example 3 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 21 * * claim 1 * |