blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0892325

EP0892325 - Radio clock for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Electronics GmbH & Co. KG
Benzstrasse 6
75196 Remchingen / DE
[1999/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Romanowski, Thomas
Rolandstrasse 58
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
02 / Kucher, Stefan
Pforzheimer Strasse 72
75236 Kämpfelbach / DE
03 / Becker, Reiner
Rosenstrasse 9
76337 Waldbronn / DE
04 / Kress, Hans-Jürgen
Lichtenacker Strasse 8
76327 Pfinztal / DE
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98110744.412.06.1998
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateDE199713055317.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19730553
[1999/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0892325
Date:20.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G04G7/02
[1999/03]
CPC:
G04R20/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/39]
Former [1999/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Funkuhr für Kraftfahrzeuge[1999/03]
English:Radio clock for motor vehicle[1999/03]
French:Montre-radio pour véhicule automobile[1999/03]
Examination procedure27.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/17]
20.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
12.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0590337  (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 54 *;
 [Y]JPH04192812  ;
 [Y]EP0305200  (PRECISION STANDARD TIME INC) [Y] 5-11 * page 2, lines 15-62 * * page 7, lines 13-17 *;
 [A]DE4012975  (VDO SCHINDLING) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 21 *;
 [A]US5301368  (HIRATA TORU) [A] 1-11 * column 2, lines 25-62 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921023), vol. 016, no. 517, Database accession no. (E - 1284), & JP04192812 A 19920713 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.