EP0867874 - Optical recording medium having dual information surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriya, Mitsurou 3-1-29, Hikarigaoka Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Taniguchi, Hiroshi 3-15-15, Kuzuha-misaki Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Shin-ichi 1-42-14, Yamate-higashi Kyotanabe-city, Kyoto 610-0357 / JP | 04 /
Nagashima, Michiyoshi 3-3-8, Shikanodai-higashi Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Sugihara, Yasuhiro 4-6-23, Myoken-higashi Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | [1999/13] |
Former [1998/40] | 01 /
Moriya, Mitsurou 3-1-29, Hikarigaoka Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Taniguchi, Hiroshi 3-15-15, Kuzuha-misaki Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Tanaka, Shin-ichi 10-C-403, Hotta-cho, Fukakusa Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | |||
04 /
Nagashima, Michiyoshi 3-3-8, Shikanodai-higashi Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Sugihara, Yasuhiro 4-6-23, Myoken-higashi Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 98110772.5 | 27.12.1995 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | JP19940327961 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32796194 | JP19950313377 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: JP 31337795 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867874 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867874 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867874 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B23/40 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
G11B7/253 (EP,US);
G11B5/62 (KR);
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
G11B23/40 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B7/254 (EP,US);
G11B7/256 (EP,US);
G11B7/258 (EP,US);
G11B7/266 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
G11B7/00454 (EP,US);
G11B7/2533 (EP,US);
G11B7/257 (EP,US);
G11B7/2585 (EP,US);
G11B7/2595 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12674 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/40] | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium mit zwei Informationsflächen | [1998/40] | English: | Optical recording medium having dual information surfaces | [1998/40] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique à deux surfaces d'informations | [2001/30] |
Former [1998/40] | Milieu d'enregistrement optique à deux surfaces d'information | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95120544.2 / EP0720159 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4041199 (HAMATECH HALBLEITER MASCHINENB [DE]) [A] 1-4,11-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 14; figure 3 * * column 4, line 42 - line 49 *; | [A]JPH0335446 ; | [A]EP0437223 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,11-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5360652 (KOBAYASHI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,11-13 * abstract *; | [E]WO9628818 (IBM [US], et al) [E] 5 * page 2, line 11 - line 17 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 7; figure 2 * * page 10, line 29 - line 36 *; | [E]EP0706178 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 5 * column 5, line 40 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH03268251 ; | [A]US4809022 (WILKINSON RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 5,6,11-13 * column 10, line 8 - line 13 *; | [A]US4450553 (HOLSTER PETER L [NL], et al) [A] 5,6,11-13 * column 10, line 31 - line 54; figure 3 *; | [A]JPS61248246 ; | [E]EP0745985 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [E] 7-10 * column 4, line 46 - column 7, line 2; figures 2-4 * * column 5, line 13 - line 41 * * column 7, line 3 - line 22 * * column 10, line 17 - line 31 *; | [E]EP0737966 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 7-10 * column 9, line 29 - column 10, line 2; figure 6; example 4 * * column 11; claims 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0520619 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,11,12 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 32; figure 3 * * column 5, line 22 - line 24 * * column 5, line 47 - line 50 *; | [Y]EP0409663 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7,11,12 * page 3, line 43 - line 48 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910430), vol. 015, no. 172, Database accession no. (P - 1197), & JP03035446 A 19910215 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920226), vol. 016, no. 080, Database accession no. (P - 1318), & JP03268251 A 19911128 (SHARP CORP) [A] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870326), vol. 011, no. 097, Database accession no. (P - 560), & JP61248246 A 19861105 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 6,13 * abstract * |